BILL NUMBER: AB 2656AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 17, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member De Leon FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 66014.7 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2656, as amended, De Leon. Postsecondary education: contracts for academic research. Existing law, the Donahoe Higher Education Act, sets forth the missions of the public and private segments of higher education in this state. Existing law, the State Contract Act, contains provisions that generally regulate the process through which state agencies enter into contracts for goods and services. This bill would require that any research conducted by an administrator, faculty member, or staff member of a public or private postsecondary educational institution be subject to internal institutional policies regarding minimum academic standards and protocols, as defined by the public or private postsecondary educational institution. The bill would prohibit a state agency from entering into a contract for academic research without first verifying that the contracting institution, and the administrator, faculty member, or staff member conducting the research, are subject to those internal institutional policies. The bill would also require a state agency to require the administrator, facility member, or staff member who conducts research pursuant to a contract with the State of California to certify that the research complies with those minimum academic standards and protocols. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66014.7 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66014.7. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, any research conducted pursuant to a contract with the State of California by any administrator, faculty member, or staff member of a public or private postsecondary educational institution shall be subject to internal institutional policies regarding minimum academic standards and protocols, as defined by the public or private postsecondary educational institution. (b) A state agency shall not enter into a contract with a public or private postsecondary educational institution for academic research without first verifying that the contracting institution, and the administrator, faculty member, or staff member conducting the research, are subject to the internal policies of the institution regarding minimum academic standards and protocols. (c) A state agency shall require any administrator, faculty member, or staff member of a public or private postsecondary educational institution who conducts research pursuant to a contract with the State of California to certify that the research conducted pursuant toa contract with a state agencythat contract complies with the minimum academic standards and protocols in accordance with subdivision (a).