06/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/02/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 1839.) | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/29/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/21/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/20/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/16/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 13). | |||
03/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/12/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | |||
02/11/2009 | Read first time. To print. |