|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:55 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 6391.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4579.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 5192.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|