|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 6634.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Passed on file.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4802.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 5526.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. (Corrected June 10.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|