|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 3278.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2171.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 2020.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|