California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2670 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/13/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2670ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 31, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member John A. Perez FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 8195) to Chapter 2.8 of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to the State Capitol Sustainability Task Force. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2670, John A. Perez. State Capitol Sustainability Task Force. Existing law authorizes the Director of General Services to repair and alter buildings within the Capitol area, as defined. This bill would establish the State Capitol Sustainability Task Force consisting of officials and employees of the California State Senate, the California State Assembly, the Office of the Governor, and the Office of the Lieutenant Governor to coordinate, develop, and complete a State Capitol Sustainability Initiative to further the sustainability practices at the State Capitol Building, the Legislative Office Building, and the State Capitol Park grounds. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares the following: (a) California's State Capitol opened in 1869, and is now 141 years old. In the mid-1970s, the State Capitol underwent a major restoration and renovation, reopening to the public in 1982. As one of the state's most historic and visible structures, the State Capitol Building and grounds present a unique opportunity to showcase sustainable practices, demonstrate environmental leadership, and provide environmental educational opportunities to nearly 800,000 annual visitors. (b) Operations at the State Capitol must become even more sustainable, with renewed efforts focused on energy efficiency, water conservation, reductions in greenhouse gas emissions, alternative fuel vehicles, waste diversion and recycling, improvements in indoor air quality, the use of renewable energy sources, and the purchase of environmentally friendly products. (c) The California State Legislature has instituted a number of these practices already, including replacing computer monitors with more energy-efficient flat screens, purchasing recycled content carpeting and other products, using low volatile organic compound paints, electronically distributing certain documents, and upgrading the fuel efficiency of the vehicle fleet through the purchase of hybrids. These activities save money and protect the environment; however, clearly more can be done to implement sustainable practices in the State Capitol. SEC. 2. Article 4 (commencing with Section 8195) is added to Chapter 2.8 of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, to read: Article 4. State Capitol Sustainability Task Force 8195. (a) There is hereby established the State Capitol Sustainability Task Force, referred to as the task force for purposes of this article. (b) The task force is composed of six members, appointed as follows: (1) Two members appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly, each of whom shall be a Member of the Assembly or an employee of the Assembly. (2) Two members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, each of whom shall be a Member of the Senate or an employee of the Senate. (3) One member appointed by the Governor, who shall be a member of the Governor's staff or a Governor's appointee in the executive branch of state government. (4) One member appointed by the Lieutenant Governor, who shall be a member of the Lieutenant Governor's staff. (c) Each member of the task force shall serve at the pleasure of his or her appointing power. 8195.1. (a) The task force shall coordinate, develop, and complete a State Capitol Sustainability Initiative for the State Capitol, including the State Capitol Building, the Legislative Office Building, and the State Capitol Park grounds. (b) The duties of the task force include, but are not limited to, the following: (1) Joining the California Climate Action Registry to determine, track, and reduce greenhouse gas emissions. (2) Benchmarking and monitoring building operations, such as energy and water use. (3) Increasing the overall fuel economy and fuel diversity of the vehicle fleet. (4) Improving waste diversion practices, including material and electronic waste recycling, composting, and reusing materials. (5) Investing in energy efficiency and water conservation technologies. (6) Promoting environmentally preferable purchasing, such as green and recycled content products. (7) Incorporating renewable energy, such as photovoltaic technology, into our energy supply. (8) Integrating sustainable practices, such as double-sided copying, the use of low volatile organic compound paints, integrated pest management, and electronic distribution of certain documents. (9) Partnering with utility companies, water districts, labor organizations, environmental groups, federal and local government, and private industry to develop green demonstration projects at the State Capitol. (10) Seeking a Leadership in Energy and Environmental Design (LEED) or ENERGY STAR rating. (11) Developing environmental education materials for student groups and other visitors to the State Capitol. (12) Finalizing the Capitol Park Master Plan, including improving bicycle access to the park and establishing bicycle paths for those portions of Capitol Avenue and 13th Street that are within the park grounds.