04/19/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). | |||
03/25/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |||
03/24/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
03/23/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |