05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/19/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/28/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 19). | |||
04/13/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 13). | |||
04/12/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |