LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2683
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2683
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2683
Compare Versions
AB2683 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2683 Enrolled August 16, 2010
AB2683 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2683 Amended June 14, 2010
AB2683 Amended May 17, 2010
AB2683 Amended April 13, 2010
AB2683 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2683 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2683 Enrolled August 16, 2010
AB2683 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2683 Amended June 14, 2010
AB2683 Amended May 17, 2010
AB2683 Amended April 13, 2010
AB2683 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare