|
07/06/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 45, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3940.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5050.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|