05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/12/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/28/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |||
04/22/2010 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4777.) | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |