LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2697
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2697
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2697
Action History
04/20/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/18/2010
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
02/22/2010
Read first time.
02/21/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
02/19/2010
Introduced. To print.