|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|