California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2701 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/02/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2701ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 24, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Eng FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 18955.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to the State Historical Building Code. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2701, Eng. State Historical Building Code: playgrounds. The State Historical Building Code authorizes the State Historical Building Safety Board to write regulations, and have consultation, review, and appellate functions for code and regulation issues relating to qualified historic buildings, structures, and properties. Existing law requires the replacement of equipment or modification of components inside existing playgrounds to conform to the playground-related standards set forth by the American Society for Testing and Materials and the playground-related guidelines set forth by the United States Consumer Product Safety Commission. This bill would place qualified playgrounds and playground sites with historical or cultural significance under the exclusive jurisdiction of the State Historical Building Code. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18955.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 18955.5. (a) Article 1 (commencing with Section 115725) of Part 10 of Division 104 shall not apply to a playground or a playground site deemed to be a structure, place, location, or site of historical or cultural significance pursuant to this part. (b) A playground or playground site deemed to be a qualified structure, place, location, or site pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be subject to the alternative standards and regulations adopted by the State Historical Building Safety Board under Section 18959.5 and subdivision (b) of Section 18960.