|
08/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5237.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|