|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 606, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6163.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4411.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5236.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended. (Corrected May 17.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|