|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6596.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4779.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5493.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4712.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4712.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|