|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 6688.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 4848.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4087.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 5048.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|