02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/11/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
01/04/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/21/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/10/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/02/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/13/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | |||
02/12/2009 | Read first time. To print. |