|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6784.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6707.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4872.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 9).
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5158.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|