California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2742 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill June 7, 2010
Bill April 22, 2010
Bill April 13, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010