|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 609, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6445.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4604.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5052.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|