|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 2176.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1927.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|