06/28/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/07/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5571.) | |||
05/28/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/12/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
04/12/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |