04/20/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
04/08/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |||
04/06/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |