|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 615, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6626.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Passed on file.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4711.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 19. Page 4860.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|