|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6863.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4978.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. To inactive file on motion of Senator Pavley.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5161.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|