|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6855.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4866.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5042.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|