08/31/2010 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Corbett. | |||
08/09/2010 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/04/2010 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |||
05/13/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/29/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4939.) | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |||
04/20/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
02/26/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |||
02/25/2010 | Read first time. To print. |