|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 477, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4310.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 29).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5088.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 3).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|