|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1759.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 1613.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|