05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5162.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5). | |||
04/12/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
03/02/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 1. | |||
03/01/2010 | Read first time. To print. |