|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 102, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 4097.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 5149.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|