|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4943.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|