|
08/10/2010
|
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4943.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|