|
08/24/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4943.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 3.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|