|
08/27/2010
|
Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4959.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Withdrawn from Enrollment. Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4203.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5054.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 3.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|