|
08/13/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 140, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4310.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5161.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 3.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|