|
08/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4410.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5054.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 8.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|