08/12/2010 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
07/15/2010 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
06/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |||
05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
05/17/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/17/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5188.) | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5127.). | |||
05/03/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/29/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
03/09/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 8. | |||
03/08/2010 | Read first time. To print. |