|
08/31/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Romero.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. (Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14).)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5344.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 9.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|