|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 612, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 6422.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4584.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected July 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 5030.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 9.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|