02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/19/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
03/19/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/18/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/13/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | |||
02/12/2009 | Read first time. To print. |