California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2790 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/13/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2790CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 141 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 13, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 13, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 2, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 13, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Governmental Organization (Coto (Chair), Anderson (Vice Chair), Bradford, Chesbro, Evans, Galgiani, Hall, Hill, Jeffries, Lieu, Mendoza, Portantino, V. Manuel Perez, Silva, Torres, and Tran) MARCH 17, 2010 An act to amend Section 19596.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2790, Committee on Governmental Organization. Horse racing: out-of-state thoroughbred races: the Arlington Million. Existing law authorizes a thoroughbred horse racing association or fair to distribute the audiovisual signal and accept wagers on the results of out-of-state thoroughbred races conducted in the United States during the calendar period the association or fair is conducting a race meeting, including days on which there is no live racing being conducted by the association or fair, without the consent of the organization that represents horsemen participating in the race meeting and without regard to the amount of purse. Existing law prohibits the total number of thoroughbred races imported by associations or fairs on a statewide basis from exceeding 32 per day on days when live thoroughbred or fair racing is being conducted in the state. However, that limitation excludes imported races that are part of the race card of the Kentucky Derby, Kentucky Oaks, and other specified races. This bill would add races that are part of the race card of the Arlington Million to the list of imported races not subject to the limitation of 32 races per day. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 19596.2 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 19596.2. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of law and except as provided in Section 19596.4, a thoroughbred racing association or fair may distribute the audiovisual signal and accept wagers on the results of out-of-state thoroughbred races conducted in the United States during the calendar period the association or fair is conducting a race meeting, including days on which there is no live racing being conducted by the association or fair, without the consent of the organization that represents horsemen participating in the race meeting and without regard to the amount of purses. Further, the total number of thoroughbred races imported by associations or fairs on a statewide basis under this section shall not exceed 32 per day on days when live thoroughbred or fair racing is being conducted in the state. The limitation of 32 imported races per day does not apply to any of the following: (1) Races imported for wagering purposes pursuant to subdivision (c). (2) Races imported that are part of the race card of the Kentucky Derby, the Kentucky Oaks, the Preakness Stakes, the Belmont Stakes, the Jockey Club Gold Cup, the Travers Stakes, the Arlington Million, the Breeders' Cup, the Dubai Cup, or the Haskell Invitational. (3) Races imported into the northern zone when there is no live thoroughbred or fair racing being conducted in the northern zone. (4) Races imported into the combined central and southern zones when there is no live thoroughbred or fair racing being conducted in the combined central and southern zones. (b) Any thoroughbred association or fair accepting wagers pursuant to subdivision (a) shall conduct the wagering in accordance with the applicable provisions of Sections 19601, 19616, 19616.1, and 19616.2. (c) No thoroughbred association or fair may accept wagers pursuant to this section on out-of-state races commencing after 7 p.m., Pacific standard time, without the consent of the harness or quarter horse racing association that is then conducting a live racing meeting in Orange or Sacramento Counties.