|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6857.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4875.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5340.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|