08/05/2010 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |||
08/05/2010 | Ordered returned to Senate. | |||
08/02/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4310.) | |||
07/01/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 29). | |||
06/10/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5162.) | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5). | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 17. | |||
03/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |