|
07/06/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5736.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3945.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5050.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 24.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|