|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4784.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. To inactive file on motion of Senator Hancock.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 29).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5158.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|