|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 402, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6716.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4819.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. To inactive file on motion of Senator Hancock.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 29).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5163.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|