|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4864.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. To inactive file on motion of Senator Negrete McLeod.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5088.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|